EP0286324 - Magnets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.1994 [1994/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF BIRMINGHAM Chancellor's Court, P.O. Box 363 Birmingham B15 2TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF BIRMINGHAM Chancellor's Court, P.O. Box 363 Birmingham B15 2TT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harris, Ivor Rex 30 Selly Wick Road Selly Park Birmingham, B29 7JA / GB | 02 /
Safi, Syed Hasan 54 Radnor Close Frogmill Road Frankley, B45 0JN / GB | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302927.4 | 31.03.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | GB19870007905 | 02.04.1987 Original published format: GB 8707905 | [1988/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0286324 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/06, C22C1/04, C22C1/05, C22C28/00 | [1988/41] | CPC: |
H01F1/0578 (EP,US);
B22F1/17 (EP,US);
H01F1/0558 (EP,US);
H01F1/083 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/41] | Title | German: | Magnete | [1988/41] | English: | Magnets | [1988/41] | French: | Aimants | [1988/41] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 03.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 02.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/52] | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP62177146 [ ]; | JP62074048 [ ]; | JP62180792 [ ]; | JP61067202 [ ]; | JP60217602 [ ]; | JP53037898 [ ]; | JP53000898 [ ]; | DE1940464 [ ]; | NL6717442 [ ]; | GB1554384 [ ] (MAGNETIC POLYMERS LTD); | EP0106948 [ ] (SUMITOMO SPEC METALS [JP]); | EP0108474 [ ] (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]); | US4601875 [ ] (YAMAMOTO HITOSHI [JP], et al); | EP0101552 [ ] | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 108, No. 10, March 7, 1988, Columbus, Ohio, USA ANHO, TAKESHI; "Manufacture of Permanent Magnets." page 316, column 2 - page 317, Abstract-No. 80 298q & JP-A-62 177 146, & JP62177146 A 00000000 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 108, No. 8, February 22, 1988, Columbus, Ohio, USA HIROZAWA, SATORU; "Perment Magnets and their Manufacture." page 268, Abstract-No. 60 439h & JP-A-62 074 048, & JP62074048 A 00000000 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 107, No. 20, November 16, 1986, Columbus, Ohio, USA ISHIKAWA, MAYUKI; "Apparatus for Disinfection of Tap Water." page 472, column 2, Abstract-No. 183 275p & JP-A-62 180 792, & JP62180792 A 00000000 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 105, No. 11, September 15, 1986, Columbus, Ohio, USA HAMADA, SHIGEKI; "Surface Treatment of Rare Earth Metal Alloy Powder for Permanent Magnet." page 663, column 1, Abstract-No. 107 106c & JP-A-61 067 202, & JP61067202 A 00000000 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 105, No. 5, August 4, 1986, Columbus, Ohio, USA NATORI, EIJI; "Resin Binder for Magnets. page 704, column 1, Abstract-No. 53 366s & JP-A-60 217 602, & JP60217602 A 00000000 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 91, No. 6, August 6, 1979, Columbus, Ohio, USA KAMINO, K.; "Flexible, Plastic-Bonded Rare Earth-Cobalt (RCo) Permanent Magnets." page 606, Column 1, Abstract-No. 48 390h & Goldschmidt Informiert 1979, 48, 23-9 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 89, No. 14, October 2, 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA OKONOGI, TADASHI; "Covered Permanent Magnets." page 853, column 1, Abstract No. 121 939j & JP-A-53 037 898, & JP53037898 A 00000000 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 89, No. 2, July 10, 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA KAKINUMA, NOBUO; "Rare Earth--Type Permanent Magnets with Protective Surface Coating." page 640, column 2, Abstract-No. 15 867z & JP-A-53 000 898, & JP53000898 A 00000000 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 75, No. 19, November 8, 1971, Columbus, Ohio, USA GREINACHER, EKKEHARD; "Increasing the Coercive Field Strength of Finely divided Rare Earth-Cobalt Alloys." page 172, column 2, Abstract-No. 120 827v & DE-A-1 940 464, & DE1940464 A 00000000 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 72, No. 2, January 12, 1970, Columbus, Ohio, USA N.V. PHILIPS'; "Magnetic Material." page 327, column 2, Abstract-No. 7 407h & NL-A-67 17 442, & NL6717442 A 00000000 |