EP0287260 - Medicament useful in performing vital dental pulpotomy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ultradent Products, Inc. 505 West 10200 South South Jordan, Utah 84905 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states ULTRADENT PRODUCTS, INC. 1345 East 3900 South Salt Lake City Utah 84124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Dan E., Dr. 10444 Dimple Dale Road Sandy Utah 84070 / US | [1988/42] | Representative(s) | Wharton, Peter Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | Wharton, Peter Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Inventions House Valley Court, Canal Road Bradford BD1 4SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303011.6 | 05.04.1988 | [1988/42] | Priority number, date | US19870038198 | 14.04.1987 Original published format: US 38198 | [1988/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0287260 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0287260 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/26 | [1988/42] | CPC: |
A61K33/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/42] | Title | German: | Arzneimittel zur Extraktion von lebender Pulpa Dentis | [1988/42] | English: | Medicament useful in performing vital dental pulpotomy | [1988/42] | French: | Médicament pour l'extraction de la pulpe dentaire vitale | [1988/42] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 20.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/25] | 13.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/06] | 06.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4395398 (YAMAMOTO HIROJI [JP]); | [X]US4597960 (COHEN EDGAR C [US]) |