EP0286420 - Tackified acrylic pressure sensitive adhesive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Traynor, William J. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | 02 /
Moore, Cheryl L. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | 03 /
Martin, Michael K. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | 04 /
Moon, John D. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88303148.6 | 08.04.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | US19870036589 | 10.04.1987 Original published format: US 36589 | [1988/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0286420 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0286420 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0286420 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09J133/08, C09J7/02 | [1993/06] | CPC: |
C09J139/04 (EP,US);
C09J133/08 (KR);
C09J139/06 (EP,US);
C09J7/22 (EP,US);
C09J7/38 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24959 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249983 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249984 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/41] | C09J3/14, C09J7/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/41] | Title | German: | Klebriggemachter Akrylhaftkleber | [1988/41] | English: | Tackified acrylic pressure sensitive adhesive | [1988/41] | French: | Adhésif collant sensible à la pression à base de dérivés acryliques | [1988/41] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 22.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4456741 (AMES WILLIAM A [US]) | Examination | - Polymer Handbook Bandrup, Inmergut, 2nd edition, Wiley Interscience, IV, pp. 337-341 |