EP0286428 - Method of fabricating a junction field effect transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GTE Laboratories Incorporated 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | For all designated states GTE LABORATORIES INCORPORATED 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Armiento, Craig A. 4 Badger Circle Acton Massachusetts 01720 / US | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303166.8 | 08.04.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | US19870036411 | 09.04.1987 Original published format: US 36411 | [1988/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0286428 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0286428 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/80, H01L21/28 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
H01L29/66924 (EP,US);
H01L29/7722 (EP,US);
H01L29/8083 (EP,US);
H01L29/20 (EP);
Y10S148/088 (EP,US);
Y10S438/944 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/41] | H01L29/80 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Jonction-Feldeffekt-Transistors | [1988/41] | English: | Method of fabricating a junction field effect transistor | [1988/41] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un transistor à effet de champ à jonction | [1988/41] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/38] | 25.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.02.1991 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0197838 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY: SOLID-STATE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY | [A] - (J.R. SHEALY et al.) |