EP0287302 - Cross-coupled checking circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.1996 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.1996 [1996/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANDEM COMPUTERS INCORPORATED 19333 Vallco Parkway Cupertino California 95014-2599 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states TANDEM COMPUTERS INCORPORATED 19333 Vallco Parkway Cupertino California 95014-2599 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fu, Peter L. 822 Van Dyck Court Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | 02 /
Lenoski, Daniel E. 255 South Rengstorff Avenue No. 44 Mountain View California 94040 / US | [1988/42] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303220.3 | 11.04.1988 | [1988/42] | Priority number, date | US19870039565 | 16.04.1987 Original published format: US 39565 | [1988/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0287302 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0287302 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0287302 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/16 | [1988/42] | CPC: |
G06F11/1633 (EP,US);
G01R31/3185 (EP,US);
G06F11/08 (EP,US);
G06F11/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/42] | Title | German: | Quergekoppelte Prüfschaltung | [1988/42] | English: | Cross-coupled checking circuit | [1988/42] | French: | Circuit de vérification couplé en croisé | [1988/42] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 04.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0120384 (SEQUOIA SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [XD]US4176258 (JACKSON DANIEL K [US]); | [A]EP0117295 (IBM [US]); | [A]DE2527098 (LICENTIA GMBH) |