EP0287333 - television picture zoom system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiratsuchi, Shinichi Apartment 402 3-22-6 Kirigaoka Midori-ku Yokohama Kanagawa Pref 227 / JP | [1988/42] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1988/42] | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303283.1 | 12.04.1988 | [1988/42] | Priority number, date | US19870038260 | 14.04.1987 Original published format: US 38260 | [1988/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0287333 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0287333 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0287333 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/393, H04N9/64, H04N9/74, H04N5/262, G06F15/62 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
G06T3/4007 (EP,US);
H04N5/262 (KR);
H04N1/3935 (EP,US);
H04N5/2628 (EP,US);
H04N9/64 (EP,KR,US);
H04N9/74 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/42] | H04N5/262 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/42] | Title | German: | Zoomvorrichtung für Fernsehbild | [1988/42] | English: | television picture zoom system | [1988/42] | French: | Dispositif de "zoom" pour image de télévision | [1988/42] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4282546 (REITMEIER GLENN A); | [X]US4381547 (EJIRI KOICHI [JP]); | [A]EP0093429 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0220880 (SONY CORP [JP]) |