EP0290153 - Heterobicyclic quinolone derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1990 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.10.1990 [1990/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campbell, Simon Frazer, Dr. Grey Friars Upper Street Kingsdown Deal Kent / GB | 02 /
Roberts, David Anthony, Dr. 8 Box Tree Mews Ivy Road Macclesfield Cheshire / GB | 03 /
Morris, David Stuart, Dr. 26 Wellesley Road Westgate-on-Sea Kent / GB | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [1988/45] | Graham, Philip Colin Christison Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303410.0 | 15.04.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | GB19870009448 | 21.04.1987 Original published format: GB 8709448 | [1988/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0290153 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D471/04, A61K31/47 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
C07D215/227 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/45] | Title | German: | Heterobicyclische Chinolon-Derivate | [1988/45] | English: | Heterobicyclic quinolone derivatives | [1988/45] | French: | Dérivés hétérobicycliques de la quinolone | [1988/45] | File destroyed: | 01.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 02.08.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 02.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP58096022 [ ]; | BE892148 [ ]; | EP0052016 [ ] (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]); | EP0226357 [ ] (PFIZER LTD [GB]) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 99, No. 12, September 19, 1983, Columbus, Ohio, USA Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd.; "Carbostyrils as Heart Stimulants." page 353, column 2, Abstract-No. 93 757j & JP-A-58 096 022, & JP58096022 A 00000000 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 98, No. 5, January 31, 1983, Columbus, Ohio, USA Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.; "Carbostyril Derivatives and a Cardiotonic Composition Containing them." page 643, column 1, Abstract-No. 34 510e & BE-A-892 148, & BE892148 A 00000000 |