EP0287390 - Vending machine with temperature control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.11.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states SANDEN CORPORATION 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma, 372 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoki, Kazumi 504 Fukushima Gunma-machi Gunma-gun Gunma 370-35 / JP | 02 /
Kikuchi, Yukio 2308 Minamisengi-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372 / JP | 03 /
Fukui, Tsuyoshi 1129 Ota-machi Isesaki-shi Gunma 372 / JP | [1988/42] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303420.9 | 15.04.1988 | [1988/42] | Priority number, date | JP19870057894U | 16.04.1987 Original published format: JP 5789487 U | JP19870057895U | 16.04.1987 Original published format: JP 5789587 U | JP19870057896U | 16.04.1987 Original published format: JP 5789687 U | JP19870057897U | 16.04.1987 Original published format: JP 5789787 U | JP19870125169U | 19.08.1987 Original published format: JP 12516987 U | [1988/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0287390 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0287390 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G07F9/10, G07F11/10, G05D23/275 | [1988/42] | CPC: |
G05D23/275 (EP,US);
G07F13/00 (KR);
F25D17/045 (EP,US);
G07F11/10 (EP,US);
G07F9/10 (KR);
G07F9/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1988/42] | Title | German: | Verkaufsautomat mit Temperaturüberwachung | [1988/42] | English: | Vending machine with temperature control | [1988/42] | French: | Machine de vente avec contrôle de température | [1988/42] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/01] | 08.08.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2066441 (SANKYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]GB1116956 (FERDINAND LUELF, et al); | [A]US2825488 (NELSON LAWRENCE E); | [A]DE1574263 (TN VERKAUFSAUTOMATEN GMBH); | [A]US4337892 (DIERMAYER WERNER, et al) |