EP0289192 - Acetabulum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINSBURY (INSTRUMENTS) LIMITED 7 Kingston Business Centre Fullers Way South Chessington Surrey KT9 1HF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states FINSBURY (INSTRUMENTS) LIMITED 7 Kingston Business Centre Fullers Way South Chessington Surrey KT9 1HF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tuke, Michael Antony 20 Selbourne Road Burpham Guildford Surrey / GB | [1988/44] | Representative(s) | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1988/44] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London, EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303513.1 | 19.04.1988 | [1988/44] | Priority number, date | GB19870009535 | 22.04.1987 Original published format: GB 8709535 | [1988/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0289192 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0289192 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/34 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30322 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30331 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30354 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30378 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30593 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30787 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3079 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30795 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3085 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30858 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3401 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1988/44] | Title | German: | Hüftpfanne | [1988/44] | English: | Acetabulum | [1988/44] | French: | Acétabule | [1988/44] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 28.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Request for further processing for: | 08.12.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.03.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.06.1992 | [1992/46] | Documents cited: | Search | US4044403 [ ] (D ERRICO JOSEPH); | DE2911754 [ ] (REIMER HANS DR); | EP0237751 [ ] (SULZER AG [CH]); | EP0149425 [ ] (MATHYS ROBERT CO) |