EP0289218 - A flexible composite intubation tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHERWOOD MEDICAL COMPANY 1831 Olive Street St. Louis, MO 63103 / US | [1988/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vaillancourt, Vincent L. 14 Bunyan Drive Livingston New Jersey 07038 / US | [1988/44] | Representative(s) | Bond, Bentley George, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | Bond, Bentley George, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303608.9 | 21.04.1988 | [1988/44] | Priority number, date | US19870043865 | 29.04.1987 Original published format: US 43865 | [1988/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0289218 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0289218 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61J15/00 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
A61J15/0003 (EP,US);
A61J15/0026 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/44] | Title | German: | Flexibler Verbundintubationsschlauch | [1988/44] | English: | A flexible composite intubation tube | [1988/44] | French: | Tube d'intubation flexible en matériau composite | [1988/44] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 19.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/12] | 14.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4306563 (IWATSCHENKO PETER); | [X]GB2112646 (BARD INC C R); | [A]EP0214721 (FRANKLIN MEDICAL LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0217771 (ASTRA MEDITEC AB [SE]) |