EP0291198 - Films from PVA modified with nonhydrolyzable anionic comonomers containing additives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/46] | Films from PVA modified with nonhydrolyzable anionic comonomers in the form of pouches containing cleaning compositions | ||
[1993/13] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Clorox Company 1221 Broadway Oakland, California 94612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states The Clorox Company 1221 Broadway Oakland California 94612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Chihae, (NMI) 3920 Vineyard Avenue Pleasanton California 94566 / US | 02 /
Kaufmann, Edward J. 3704 Andalucia Court San Ramon California 94583 / US | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1988/46] | Smith, Sydney Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303799.6 | 27.04.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | US19870050260 | 14.05.1987 Original published format: US 50260 | US19880175778 | 31.03.1988 Original published format: US 175778 | [1988/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0291198 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0291198 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0291198 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/04 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
C11D17/043 (EP,US);
C11D17/042 (EP,US);
C11D3/02 (EP,US);
C11D3/046 (EP,US);
C11D3/3753 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | Folien aus mit nicht hydrolysierbaren anionischen Comonomeren modifizierten PVA,die Additive enthalten | [1993/13] | English: | Films from PVA modified with nonhydrolyzable anionic comonomers containing additives | [1993/13] | French: | Films en PVA modifié par des comonomères anioniques non hydrolysables contenant des additifs | [1993/45] |
Former [1988/46] | Für Beutel verwendbare Folien aus mit nicht hydrolysierbaren anionischen Comonomeren modifiziertem PVA, die Reinigungsmittelzusammensetzungen enthalten | ||
Former [1988/46] | Films from PVA modified with nonhydrolyzable anionic comonomers in the form of pouches containing cleaning compositions | ||
Former [1988/46] | Films sous forme de sachets en PVA modifié par des comonomères anioniques non hydrolysables contenant des compositions détergentes | Examination procedure | 24.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.08.1994
19.08.1994
ADMISSIBLE Kuraray Co., Ltd. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki, Okoyama-ken 710 / JP Opponent's representative Weinberger, Rudolf Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.08.1994
19.08.1994
ADMISSIBLE Kuraray Co., Ltd. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki, Okoyama-ken 710 / JP Opponent's representative Weinberger, Rudolf, Dr. Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | 15.09.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.04.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.12.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.01.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 01.06.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/36] | Appeal following opposition | 14.03.1996 | Appeal received No. T0257/96 | 30.05.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 27.04.1996 | [2004/38] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 10.11.1993 | |
LI | 10.11.1993 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [2000/06] | LU | 30.04.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2090603 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO); | [Y]US4557852 (SCHULZ GERALD O [US], et al); | [Y]EP0079712 (CLOROX CO [US]); | [Y]EP0160254 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [Y]US4156047 (WYSONG ROBERT D [US]); | [Y]US3505303 (LINDEMANN MARTIN K); | [XP]EP0223175 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) |