EP0289301 - Master cylinder assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.1990 [1990/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Colgate, Brian Martin Old House The Rocks Clearwell Meend Coleford Gloucestershire, GL16 8JR / GB | [1988/44] | Representative(s) | Waite, Anthony William, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | Waite, Anthony William, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303838.2 | 28.04.1988 | [1988/44] | Priority number, date | GB19870010273 | 30.04.1987 Original published format: GB 8710273 | [1988/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0289301 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0289301 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/20 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
B60T11/203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/44] | Title | German: | Hauptzylinderaufbau | [1988/44] | English: | Master cylinder assembly | [1988/44] | French: | Structure d'un maître-cylindre | [1988/44] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 29.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/07] | 19.09.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2902121 (MORLEY YOUNG, et al); | [Y]GB1511539 (GIRLING LTD); | [Y]DD238950 (FORTSCHRITT VEB K [DD]) |