EP0292132 - Telephone trunk line testing circuitry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burton, Peter G. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul Minnesota 55144-1000 / US | 02 /
Kennedy, James K. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul Minnesota 55144-1000 / US | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88303899.4 | 29.04.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | US19870052446 | 20.05.1987 Original published format: US 52446 | [1988/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0292132 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0292132 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0292132 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/28 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
H04M3/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/47] | Title | German: | Prüfschaltung für Fernsprechverbindungsleitungen | [1988/47] | English: | Telephone trunk line testing circuitry | [1988/47] | French: | Circuit de test pour ligne téléphonique de jonction | [1988/47] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 11.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2557412 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [A]WO8601664 (TII COMPUTER SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [A]US4581493 (GAZZO JOHN [US], et al); | [A]EP0211261 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |