EP0292156 - Indexable insert cutters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.10.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1991 | Refusal of application | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANDVIK HARD MATERIALS LTD Torrington Avenue P O Box 109 Coventry CV4 9UW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states SANDVIK HARD MATERIALS LTD Torrington Avenue P O Box 109 Coventry CV4 9UW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jordan, James William 68 Dewis House Riley Square Bell Green Coventry CV2 1LW / GB | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | Gura, Henry Alan MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [1988/47] | Application number, filing date | 88304089.1 | 06.05.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | GB19870012080 | 21.05.1987 Original published format: GB 8712080 | GB19870017591 | 24.07.1987 Original published format: GB 8717591 | [1988/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0292156 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/26, A24C5/58 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
A24C5/473 (EP,US);
B26D7/2614 (EP,US);
B26D7/2628 (EP,US);
Y10S83/955 (EP,US);
Y10T83/483 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9399 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9464 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/47] | Title | German: | Einsatzmesser mit mehreren Arbeitslagen | [1988/47] | English: | Indexable insert cutters | [1988/47] | French: | Couteau rapporté à plusieurs positions d'utilisation | [1988/47] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 09.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 28.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/51] | 01.08.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/51] | Request for further processing for: | 07.01.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.02.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3209633 (STEFAN DOERMAN ERYK); | [A]GB1469684 (MOLINS LTD); | [A]US3340757 (WILLY RUDSZINAT); | [A]DE1436506 (HUCK WILLIAM F); | [A]GB934295 (ERYK STEFAN DOERMAN, et al); | [A]FR2086600 (ALUSUISSE FRANCE SA); | [A]DE3311796 (WINKLER ALEXANDER); | [A]GB2046651 (MOLINS LTD); | [A]EP0016615 (MOLINS PLC [GB]) |