EP0294938 - Exponential decay time constant measurement using frequency of offset-phase locked loop: system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | ||
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dukes, John Noland 27783 Lupine Road Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
Carlsen, William F., Jr. 2061 Carol Avenue Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 03 /
Pittaro, Richard J. 70 Curry Court San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304136.0 | 06.05.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | US19870047818 | 08.05.1987 Original published format: US 47818 | [1988/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0294938 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0294938 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294938 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01R25/00, G01R23/00 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
G01N21/6408 (EP,US);
G01N25/00 (EP,US);
G01R23/00 (EP,US);
G01N2021/3144 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
Y10T436/207497 (EP,US);
Y10T436/209163 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1988/50] | G01N21/64, G01R23/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/50] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Messung der Zeitkonstante eines Exponentialzerfalls über die Frequenz einer Offset-Phasenregelschleife | [1988/50] | English: | Exponential decay time constant measurement using frequency of offset-phase locked loop: system and method | [1988/50] | French: | Système et procédé pour mesurer la constance de temps d'une décroissance exponentielle en utilisant la fréquence d'une boucle de régulation de phase offset | [1988/50] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 05.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.05.1993
04.06.1993
ADMISSIBLE Radiometer A/S Akandevej 21 DK-2700 Bronshoj / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.05.1993
04.06.1993
ADMISSIBLE Radiometer A/S Emdrupvej 72 DK-2400 Kopenhagen NV / DK | 30.06.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.12.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.01.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 15.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.10.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 06.05.1996 | FR | 31.01.1997 | DE | 02.03.1999 | [2000/12] |
Former [1997/44] | GB | 06.05.1996 | |
FR | 31.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/17] | GB | 06.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57175276 ; | [A]GB2089029 (SCINTREX LTD); | [A]DE2815434 (MORITA MFG) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 23 (P-171)[1168] 29th January 1983; & JP-A-57 175 276 (FUJITSU K.K.) 28-10-1982, & JP57175276 A 00000000 |