EP0292163 - Automatic gain control apparatus for a video signal processor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rumreich, Mark Francis 5333 North Guilford Indianapolis Indiana / US | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | Ahrens, Thomas, et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Licensing & Intellectual Property, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | Ahrens, Thomas, et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Patent Department, Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1992/45] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1992/27] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1988/47] | Kennington, Eric Alasdair London Patent Operation GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNICAL SERVICES CO. Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304152.7 | 06.05.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | US19870046355 | 06.05.1987 Original published format: US 46355 | [1988/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0292163 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0292163 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0292163 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/53 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
H03G3/3052 (EP,US);
H04N5/52 (EP,KR,US);
H03G3/3068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur automatischen Verstärkungsregelung für einen Videosignalprozessor | [1988/47] | English: | Automatic gain control apparatus for a video signal processor | [1988/47] | French: | Appareil de réglage automatique du gain pour un processeur de signal vidéo | [1988/47] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 11.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/18] | 01.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/11] | 01.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/11] | 18.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Request for further processing for: | 01.02.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4237490 (HARFORD JACK R); | [A]US3697883 (WILCOX MILTON E); | [A]GB1188752 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) |