EP0341355 - Game device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hwang, Sheng-Lee No. 84, 6F-3, Sec. 3 San-Min Road Taichung City / TW | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states Hwang, Sheng-Lee No. 84, 6F-3, Sec. 3 San-Min Road Taichung City / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Parry, Christopher Stephen, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | Parry, Christopher Stephen, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304237.6 | 11.05.1988 | [1989/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0341355 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0341355 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A63F7/04 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
A63F7/042 (EP,US);
A63F7/04 (EP,US);
A63F2007/4018 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/46] | Title | German: | Spielvorrichtung | [1989/46] | English: | Game device | [1989/46] | French: | Dispositif de jeu | [1989/46] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 06.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.12.1991 | GR | 04.12.1991 | SE | 04.12.1991 | LU | 31.05.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 04.12.1991 | |
SE | 04.12.1991 | ||
LU | 31.05.1992 | ||
Former [1992/46] | AT | 04.12.1991 | |
SE | 04.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/28] | SE | 04.12.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3115344 (THEISEN VINCENT A); | [A]US3211457 (DREYER ALLEN F); | [A]US3840234 (FELSTEN J); | [A]FR2589076 (ROYER YVES [FR]) |