EP0291313 - Image recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | ||
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION No. 26-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 106 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murahashi, Takashi c/o KONICA CORPORATION 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fujita, Hisao c/o KONICA CORPORATION 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nakazawa, Toshihiko c/o KONICA CORPORATION 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Takesue, Toshihiro c/o KONICA CORPORATION 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Motoi, Toshihiro c/o KONICA CORPORATION 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304322.6 | 12.05.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | JP19870117684 | 14.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11768487 | [1988/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0291313 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0291313 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0291313 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/04, G02B27/00, H04N1/12 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
H04N1/1135 (EP,US);
G02B27/0031 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/46] | G03G15/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1988/46] | Title | German: | Bildaufzeichnungsgerät | [1988/46] | English: | Image recording apparatus | [1988/46] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement d'images | [1988/46] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 16.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 08.12.1993 | IT | 08.12.1993 | NL | 08.12.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | DE | 08.12.1993 | |
IT | 08.12.1993 | ||
NL | 08.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | DE | 08.12.1993 | |
NL | 08.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | DE | 08.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2501385 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]EP0217325 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [X]DE3317538 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US4435733 (TAGAWA TAKAO [JP], et al) | [A] - OPTIK, vol. 70, no.2, May 1985, pages 76-85, Wissenschaftliche Verlagsgesellschaft mbH, Stuttgart, Deutschland; J. KROSS et al.: "Zur Korrektion optischer Systeme mit asphärischen Flächen" |