EP0297716 - Spring bow, centralizer and method for its use in a borehole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.01.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEATHERFORD-PETCO, Inc. 1360 Post Oak Boulevard Suite 1000 Houston, Texas 77056 / US | [1992/36] |
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states WEATHERFORD U.S. Inc. 1360 Post Oak Boulevard Houston Texas 77056 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langer, Friedrich H. 3023 Kenross Street Houston Texas 77043 / US | [1989/01] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | ||
Former [1989/01] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304630.2 | 23.05.1988 | [1989/01] | Priority number, date | US19870056488 | 29.05.1987 Original published format: US 56488 | [1989/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0297716 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/10 | [1989/01] | CPC: |
E21B17/1028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/01] | Title | German: | Federbogen, Zentriervorrichtung und Verfahren für deren Anwendung in einem Bohrloch | [1989/01] | English: | Spring bow, centralizer and method for its use in a borehole | [1989/01] | French: | Arc-ressort, centreur et procédé pour leur utilisation dans un trou de forage | [1989/01] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 26.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 20.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/10] | 22.10.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2656890 (BRANDON ARTHUR H); | [AD]US2665762 (ALTHOUSE JR WILLIAM S); | [A]US2728399 (LOUIS KLUCK); | [A]US3343608 (SOLUM JAMES R); | [A]US3556042 (LAUGHLIN WILLIAM N); | [AD]US3566965 (SOLUM JAMES R); | [A]US3749168 (HALL J); | [AD]US4531582 (MUSE JOHN F [US], et al); | [AD]DE3508086 (WEATHERFORD OIL TOOL); | [A]GB2179079 (WILLIAM HUNT ENGINEERS LIMITED) |