EP0293214 - System for producing dithered images on asymmetric grids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.1994 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.1994 [1994/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard Massachusetts 01754-1418 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard Massachusetts 01754-1418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ulichney, Robert A. 17 Healey Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02138 / US | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304814.2 | 27.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | US19870056630 | 29.05.1987 Original published format: US 56630 | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293214 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293214 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/40 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
G06T1/00 (KR);
H04N1/4058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | System zur Erzeugung von Zitterbildern nach asymmetrischen Rastern | [1988/48] | English: | System for producing dithered images on asymmetric grids | [1988/48] | French: | Système produisant des images en demi-teintes selon des grilles asymétriques | [1988/48] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 22.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/13] | 03.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2535477 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]); | [Y]US4084183 (KELLER HANS, et al); | [A]GB2098022 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG); | [A]US4449150 (KATO TOMOKAZU [JP]); | [A]FR2516329 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) |