EP0293235 - Display device and driving system thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Numao, Takazi Akebono-ryo 2613, Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Kunihiko 368-1, Ryofukuji Kashiba-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun Nara-ken / JP | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [1988/48] | Brown, Kenneth Richard R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304846.4 | 27.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | JP19870133816 | 29.05.1987 Original published format: JP 13381687 | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293235 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293235 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293235 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
G09G3/3644 (EP);
G09G2310/0227 (EP);
G09G2320/0247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1988/48] | Title | German: | Anzeigegerät und Ansteuersystem dafür | [1988/48] | English: | Display device and driving system thereof | [1988/48] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage et son système de commande | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 27.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0177247 |