EP0294992 - Doctoring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1993 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERMO ELECTRON-WEB SYSTEMS, INC. P.O. Box 269 Sword Street35 Auburn Massachusetts 01501 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states THERMO ELECTRON-WEB SYSTEMS, INC. P.O. Box 269 Sword Street35 Auburn Massachusetts 01501 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goodnow, Ronald Francis 10 Fairview Drive Leicester Massachusetts, 01524 / US | 02 /
Austin, Robert Frederick 146 Indian Meadow Northborough Massachusetts, 01532 / US | 03 /
Reid, Robert Alexander 1 Stevens Park Road Charlton City Massachusetts, 01508 / US | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304972.8 | 01.06.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | US19870059508 | 08.06.1987 Original published format: US 59508 | [1988/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0294992 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0294992 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294992 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D21G3/00 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
D21G3/005 (EP,US);
B05C11/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1988/50] | Title | German: | Schabervorrichtung | [1988/50] | English: | Doctoring apparatus | [1988/50] | French: | Appareil de raclage | [1988/50] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 27.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3163878 [ ] (ERIC SMITH, et al); | DE1761644 [ ] (VALMET OY FA); | GB1316105 [ ] (ROSS LTD JAMES); | US3748686 [ ] (WINTERBURN C, et al); | US3803665 [ ] (WINTERBURN C, et al); | DE3136085 [ ] (VICKERS LTD [GB]); | EP0117670 [ ] (BELOIT WALMSLEY LTD [GB]) |