EP0294996 - Scanning fluorescent detection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robertson, Charles William, Jr. P.O. Box 154 Rockland Delaware 19732 / US | 02 /
Dam, Rudy Johan 3 Queen Lane Landenberg Pennsylvania 19350 / US | 03 /
Prober, James Merrill 118 Haywood Road Wilmington Delaware 19807 / US | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | Barlow, Roy James, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Barlow, Roy James, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1988/50] | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304979.3 | 01.06.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | US19870060874 | 12.06.1987 Original published format: US 60874 | [1988/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0294996 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0294996 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294996 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
G01N21/645 (EP,US);
G01N27/44721 (EP,US);
G01J2001/062 (EP,US);
G01J2003/1226 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6421 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6441 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/50] | Title | German: | Abtastsystem zur Bestimmung der Fluoreszenz | [1988/50] | English: | Scanning fluorescent detection system | [1988/50] | French: | Système de détection fluorescent à balayage | [1988/50] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 26.10.1994 | LI | 26.10.1994 | SE | 26.01.1995 | [1995/31] |
Former [1995/29] | SE | 26.01.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3764512 (GREENWOOD I, et al); | [AD]US4162405 (CHANCE BRITTON [US], et al); | [A]FR2558262 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]); | [X]US4580059 (WOLFBEIS OTTO S [AT], et al); | [XPD]EP0252683 (DU PONT [US]) |