EP0295123 - Multi-channel linear concentrate pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company 310 North Avenue, P.O.Box 1734 Atlanta Georgia 30313 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states THE COCA-COLA COMPANY 310 North Avenue, P.O.Box 1734 Atlanta, Georgia 30313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rudick, Arthur G. 907 Wynnes Ridge Circle Marietta Georgia 30067 / US | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | Leale, Robin George, et al FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305319.1 | 10.06.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | US19870060336 | 10.06.1987 Original published format: US 60336 | [1988/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0295123 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0295123 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295123 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/00, B67D1/10 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
B67D1/0051 (EP,US);
B67D1/10 (EP,KR,US);
B67D1/0052 (EP,US);
B67D1/102 (EP,US);
B67D1/105 (EP,US);
B67D1/1231 (EP,US);
B67D1/1293 (EP,US);
B67D2001/0827 (EP,US);
B67D2210/00052 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0612 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1988/50] | Title | German: | Kolbenpumpe mit mehreren Kanälen für Konzentrate | [1988/50] | English: | Multi-channel linear concentrate pump | [1988/50] | French: | Pompe à piston pour liquide concentré, comportant plusieurs canaux | [1988/50] | Examination procedure | 21.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 05.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49] | Request for further processing for: | 30.10.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 30.10.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.12.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.07.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1063927 [ ] (BAELE SA USINE); | DE1045806 [ ] (LUDWIG MALZBENDER FA); | US3388603 [ ] (CLARK HARRY S); | US3401639 [ ] (SCHWERTFEGER OWEN J, et al); | US3598287 [ ] (MAN HEIKO T DE); | FR2176934 [ ] (USM CORP); | DE2342060 [ ] (SHIMAZAKI MIXING EQUIPMENT CO); | US3838948 [ ] (MC CORVEY R); | US4392508 [ ] (SWITALL THOMAS G); | US4556367 [ ] (SCHMID CARL E [US]) |