EP0295875 - Minimizing residual charge carryover in an asynchronous raster input scanner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.07.1997 [1997/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michaels, Thomas B. 7 Old Forge Lane Pittsford New York 14534 / US | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1989/21] | Hill, Cecilia Ann Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1989/05] | Frain, Timothy John Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | ||
Former [1988/51] | Frain, Timothy John Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305433.0 | 15.06.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | US19870061747 | 15.06.1987 Original published format: US 61747 | [1988/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0295875 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0295875 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295875 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/40 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
H04N1/40056 (EP,US);
H04N23/73 (EP,US);
H04N25/626 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/51] | Title | German: | Herabsetzung des Rückstandsladungstransfers in einem asynchronen Rastereingangsabtaster | [1988/51] | English: | Minimizing residual charge carryover in an asynchronous raster input scanner | [1988/51] | French: | Réduction au minimum du transfert de charges résiduelles dans un dispositif asynchrone d'analyse de trames d'entrée | [1988/51] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 19.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 15.06.1996 | [1997/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58106948 ; | [A]US4367493 (MATTESON RONALD G); | [A]EP0142358 (IBM [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 214 (E-199)(1359) 21 September 1983, & JP-A-58 106948 (HITACHI) 25 June 1983,, & JP58106948 A 19830625 |