EP0326735 - Glass-ceramic article, process for its production and thermally crystallizable glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.1991 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORNING GLASS WORKS Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | For all designated states Corning Glass Works Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | ||
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states Corning Glass Works Sullivan Park FR-212 Corning New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andrieu, Andre 7 Ave de Stalingrad Nemours / FR | 02 /
Comte, Marie J.M. 31 rue Villiot Paris / FR | 03 /
Ferry, Frederick J.M. 29-35 rue des Yebles Avon / FR | 04 /
Mazeau, Jean-Pierre 50 voie de la Liberté Samoreau Avon / FR | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305454.6 | 15.06.1988 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | FR19880001288 | 04.02.1988 Original published format: FR 8801288 | US19880163528 | 03.03.1988 Original published format: US 163528 | [1989/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0326735 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326735 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C03C10/16 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
C03C10/16 (EP);
C03C10/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/32] | Title | German: | Glaskeramischer Gegenstand, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und thermisch kristallisierbares Glas | [1989/32] | English: | Glass-ceramic article, process for its production and thermally crystallizable glass | [1989/32] | French: | Article vitrocéramique, procédé pour sa fabrication et verre thermiquement cristallisable | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 18.10.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 09.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1991 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0267682 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]); | [XD]EP0126572 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]) |