EP0295906 - Extrusion of compositions of polyamides and epoxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Du Pont Canada Inc. Box 2200, Streetsville Postal Station Mississauga Ontario L5M 2H3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states Du Pont Canada Inc. Box 2200, Streetsville Postal Station Mississauga, Ontario L5M 2H3 / CA | ||
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states DU PONT CANADA INC. Box 2200 Streetsville Postal Station Mississauga Ontario L5M 2H3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dykes, David Scott 307-66 Greenview Drive Kingston Ontario, K7M 7C5 / CA | 02 /
Kuhnemann, Klaus Dieter R.R. Nr. 3 Bath Ontario, K0H 1G0 / CA | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1988/51] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305493.4 | 16.06.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | GB19870014234 | 17.06.1987 Original published format: GB 8714234 | [1988/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0295906 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295906 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/48, B29B9/06, // B29K77:00 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
C08G69/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/51] | Title | German: | Extrusion von Mischungen von Polyamiden und Epoxiden | [1988/51] | English: | Extrusion of compositions of polyamides and epoxides | [1988/51] | French: | Extrusion de compositions de polyamides et d'époxydes | [1988/51] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 18.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]ZA6805738 ; | [A]JP7338224 ; | [A]US4171404 (CARROLL CLIFFORD C [US]); | [A]EP0194523 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [AD]GB2175305 (ELM INVENTA AG) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 71, 17th November 1969, page 32, abstract no. 92223s, Columbus, Ohio, US; & ZA-A-68 05 738 (CIBA LTD) 07-02-1969, & ZA6805738 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTTRACTS, vol. 81, no. 12, 23rd September 1974, page 53, abstract no. 64684f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-73 38 224 (TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.) 16-11-1973, & JP7338224 A 00000000 |