EP0314266 - Flexible razor head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Evan Nai-keung 879 Riverside Drive Fairfield Connecticut 06430 / US | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Coxon, Philip, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | Coxon, Philip, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305665.7 | 21.06.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | US19870115781 | 30.10.1987 Original published format: US 115781 | [1989/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0314266 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0314266 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/40 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
B26B21/4012 (EP,US);
B26B21/10 (KR);
B26B21/4018 (EP,US);
B26B21/4025 (EP,US);
B26B21/4068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/18] | Title | German: | Biegsamer Nassrasiererkopf | [1989/18] | English: | Flexible razor head | [1989/18] | French: | Tête de rasoir flexible | [1989/18] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 18.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3651014 (WITSIEPE WILLIAM K); | [A]WO8303072 (GILLETTE CO [US]); | [XD]US4443939 (MOTTA VINCENT C [US], et al); | [A]US4459744 (ESNARD MIGUEL H [US]) |