EP0296837 - Input device possessing plural functions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Keiji 1-1-50-203 Suzaku 5-chome Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | [1988/52] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305706.9 | 22.06.1988 | [1988/52] | Priority number, date | JP19870156224 | 22.06.1987 Original published format: JP 15622487 | [1988/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0296837 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0296837 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0296837 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06K11/18 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
G06F3/038 (EP,US);
G06F3/03543 (EP,US);
G06K11/00 (EP,US);
H04N1/00204 (EP,US);
H04N1/00241 (EP,US);
H04N1/0473 (EP,US);
H04N1/107 (EP,US);
H04N1/193 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0063 (EP,US);
H04N2201/007 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0471 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04724 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04734 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1988/52] | G06K11/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1988/52] | Title | German: | Eingabegerät mit mehreren Funktionen | [1988/52] | English: | Input device possessing plural functions | [1988/52] | French: | Dispositif d'entrée possédant plusieurs fonctions | [1988/52] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 25.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0166432 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) |