EP0300631 - Direct-positive silver halide emulsion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55144-1000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center St. Paul, Minnesota 55101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hine, Philip Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Co 2501 Hudson Rd St Paul Minnesota 55144-1000 / US | 02 /
Shor, Steven M Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Co 2501 Hudson Rd St Paul Minnesota 55144-1000 / US | [1989/04] | Representative(s) | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306020.4 | 01.07.1988 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | US19870076007 | 21.07.1987 Original published format: US 76007 | [1989/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0300631 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0300631 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0300631 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/485, G03C1/06 | [1993/36] | CPC: |
G03C1/48515 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/04] | G03C1/485 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/04] | Title | German: | Direkt-positive Silberhalogenidemulsion | [1989/04] | English: | Direct-positive silver halide emulsion | [1989/04] | French: | Emulsion positive directe à l'halogénure d'argent | [1989/04] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 04.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3367778 (BERRIMAN ROBERT W); | [A]DE2323462 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]DE2512175 (AGFA GEVAERT AG 5090 LEVERKUSE); | [A]EP0093002 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) | Examination | US4082554 |