EP0298688 - Light beam deflection devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umezu, Nobuhiko c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306091.5 | 04.07.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | JP19870105316 | 10.07.1987 Original published format: JP 10531687 | [1989/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0298688 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0298688 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298688 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/33, G11B7/00 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
G11B7/1369 (EP,US);
G02F1/33 (KR);
G02F1/335 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1989/02] | Title | German: | Lichtbündelablenkvorrichtung | [1989/02] | English: | Light beam deflection devices | [1989/02] | French: | Dispositif de déflection d'un faisceau de lumière | [1989/02] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 06.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0015685 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]US4346965 (SPRAGUE ROBERT A, et al); | [A]EP0158850 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US4592621 (AMANO SATORU [JP], et al) |