EP0302597 - Gas-pervious composite film and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1992 | Change - withdrawal | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tonen Chemical Corporation 1-1, Tsukiji 4-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states Tonen Chemical Corporation 1-1, Tsukiji 4-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1989/06] | For all designated states TONEN SEKIYUKAGAKU K.K. 1-1, Tsukiji, 4-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kagawa, Seiji 27-1-126, Baba 3-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/06] | Representative(s) | Veldhuizen, Albert Dirk Willem, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre PO Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | Veldhuizen, Albert Dirk Willem, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre PO Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306105.3 | 05.07.1988 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | JP19870170497 | 08.07.1987 Original published format: JP 17049787 | [1989/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0302597 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0302597 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/18, // B29K105:04, B29L7:00 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
B29C55/005 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (US);
B29C70/025 (EP,US);
B29C70/64 (EP,US);
B32B15/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B37/144 (EP,US);
B32B38/0032 (EP,US);
B29C70/687 (EP,US);
B29K2105/04 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0049 (EP,US);
B32B2305/026 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/06] | Title | German: | Gasdurchlässige Verbundfolie und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1989/06] | English: | Gas-pervious composite film and method for its production | [1989/06] | French: | Film composite perméable aux gaz et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1989/06] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 24.01.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP49130978 ; | [A]JP57105120 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, no. 75-54638w [33], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-49 130 978 (DAINIPPON PRINTING) 16-12-1974, & JP49130978 A 00000000 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL, no. 82-66482E [32], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-57 105 120 (KANEBO) 30-06-1982, & JP57105120 A 00000000 |