EP0298695 - Tartaric acid amide derivative and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo, 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toda, Fumio 1431-3 Ushibuchi Shigenobu-cho Onsen-gun Ehime 791-02 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Koichi 6-7-17 Kuwabara Matsuyama Ehime 790 / JP | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Sawers, Lawrence Peter, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1989/02] | Application number, filing date | 88306106.1 | 05.07.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | JP19870166933 | 06.07.1987 Original published format: JP 16693387 | [1989/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0298695 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0298695 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298695 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C233/05, C07D317/32, C07C231/00, C07B57/00 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
C07D317/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/02] | C07C103/34, C07D317/32, C07C102/00, C07B57/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/02] | Title | German: | Weinsäureamidderivate und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1989/02] | English: | Tartaric acid amide derivative and method of producing the same | [1989/02] | French: | Dérivés d'amide de l'acide tartrique et méthode pour leur préparation | [1989/02] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 08.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0198202 (MITSUBISHI CORP [JP]) | [XD] - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA vol. 60, 1977, pages 301-325; D.SEEBACH et al.: "Herstellung von Hilfstoffen für die asymmetrische Synthese aus Weinsäure. Addition von Butyllithium and Aldehyde in chiralem Medium" | [X] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS vol. 25, no. 51, 1984, pages 5911-5912; Y. FUJUTANI et al.: "Stereoselective conjugate addition of organoaluminum reagents to chiral alpha, beta-unsaturated ketals" | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACT vol. 99, no. 11, 12th September 1983, page 519, column 1, abstract no. 87600m, Columbus, Ohio, USA; D. SEEBACH et al.: "Chiral media for asymmetric solvent inductions. (S,S)-(+)-1,4-Bis (dimethylamino)-2, 3-dim ethoxybutane from (R,R)-(+)-tartaric acid diethyl ester. (1,4-Butanediamine, 2, 3-dimethoxy-N,N,N'N'-tetramethyl- (S,S)-)";&ORG. SYNTH., 1983, 61, PAGE 24-34 | [A] - CHEMISTRY LETTERS 1986, pages 1909-1912, The Chemical Society of Japan; F.TODA et al.: "Separation of Isomeric Alcohols by Selective Complexation with N,N,N'N'-Tetracyclohexylfumaramide and N,N,N'N'-Tetraisoprophylfumaramide, and Structures of Two Resulting Crystalline Adducts." | [A] - CHEMISTRY LETTERS pages 113-116, The Chemical Society of Japan; J. TODA et al.: "Inclusion Properties of N,N,N',N',-Tetracyclohexyfumaramide and Crystal Structure of its 1:1 Molecular Complex with Ethanol." | [A] - CHEMISTRY LETTERS 1987, pages 1393-1396, The Chemical Society of Japan; F. TODA et al.: " A novel Host Compound with High Inclusion ability N,N,N',N'-Tetracyclohexyl 2, 2' Structure of its 1:1 Phenol Complex." | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS vol. 94, no. 17, 1981, page 762, column 1, abstract no. 139 766p, Columbus, Ohio, USA; J.-B. BEHR et al.: "Molecular receptors, Functionalized and chiral macrocyclic polyethers derived from tartaric acid" | Examination | - CHEMISTRY LETTERS, 1986, pages 1909-1912, The Chemical Society of Japan; F. TODA et al, "Separation of Isomeric Alcohols by Selective Compexation with N,N,N',N'-Tetracyclohexylfumaramide and N,N,N',N'-Tetraisopropylfumaramide, and Structures of Two Resulting Crystalline Adducts" | - CHEMISTRY LETTERS, 1986, pages 113-116, The Chemical Society of Japan; J. TODA et al, "Inclusion Properties of N,N,N',N'-Tetracyclohexylfumaramide and Crystal Structure of its 1:1 Molecular Complex with Ethanol" | - CHEMISTRY LETTERS, 1987, pages 1393-1396, The Chemical Society of Japan; F. TODA et al, "A Novel Host Compound with High Inclusion Ability, N,N,N',N'-Tetracyclohexyl 2,2'-biphenyldicarboxymide, and Crystal Sturcutre of Its 1:1 Phenol Complex" |