EP0298745 - Thin film electroluminescent device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikami, Akiyoshi 343-2, Nishiboujyo Yamatotakada-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Taniguchi, Kouji 28-82, Sakate Tawaramoto-cho Shiki-gu Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Ogura, Takashi 2-3-6-807, Oomiya-cho Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Yoshida, Masaru 5-6-1, Tatsutakita Ikaruga-cho Ikoma-gun Nara-ken / JP | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306221.8 | 07.07.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | JP19870170314 | 08.07.1987 Original published format: JP 17031487 | [1989/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0298745 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0298745 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298745 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/14 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
H05B33/145 (EP,US);
Y10S428/917 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/02] | Title | German: | Dünnfilm-Elektrolumineszenzgerät | [1989/02] | English: | Thin film electroluminescent device | [1989/02] | French: | Dispositif électroluminescent à film mince | [1989/02] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/14] | 20.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0209668 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]EP0249942 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD [JP]) |