EP0298775 - Franking machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST LIMITED South Street Romford Essex RM1 2AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states NEOPOST LIMITED South Street Romford, Essex RM1 2AR / GB | ||
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS LIMITED P.O. Box 3 South Street Romford Essex, RM1 2AR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilham, Dennis Thomas 12 Larkin Close Brentwood Essex CM13 2SL / GB | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al Fry Heath & Spence The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | ||
Former [2001/23] | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al HUGHES CLARK & CO, 114/118 Southampton Row London WC1B 5AA / GB | ||
Former [1991/38] | Loughrey, Richard Vivian Patrick HUGHES CLARK & CO 114-118 Southampton Row London WC1B 5AA / GB | ||
Former [1989/02] | Loughrey, Richard Vivian Patrick HUGHES CLARK & CO 63 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306277.0 | 08.07.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | GB19870016183 | 09.07.1987 Original published format: GB 8716183 | [1989/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0298775 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0298775 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298775 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G02B17/02 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
G07B17/00193 (EP);
G07B17/00508 (EP);
G07B2017/00201 (EP);
G07B2017/00241 (EP);
G07B2017/00532 (EP);
G07B2017/00596 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/02] | Title | German: | Frankiermaschine | [1989/02] | English: | Franking machine | [1989/02] | French: | Machine à affranchir | [1989/02] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/14] | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 08.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 09.10.1996 | Appeal received No. T0120/97 | 11.12.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.10.2001 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 08.10.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 18.09.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.09.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP01122156.1 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 16.10.2001 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Request for further processing for: | 02.04.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.1996 | Decision despatched | 23.03.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 08.04.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 08   M02   Fee paid on   25.09.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2005/30] | DE | 01.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | EP0230658 [ ]; | DE3132765 [ ]; | DE3712100 [ ]; | US4636975 [ ] |