EP0298778 - Semiconductor laser devices and methods of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morimoto, Taiji 989-4, Hokkejishin-machi Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Masahiro 2-11, Kagiya-cho Tokai-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Kaneiwa, Shinji 2-301, Katsuragi-cho Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Hayashi, Hiroshi 11-5-8, nagamodai Kamo-cho Soraku-gun / JP | 05 /
Kawanishi, Hidenori 46-2, Konoike Higashiosaka-shi Osaka / JP | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306284.6 | 08.07.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | JP19870173294 | 10.07.1987 Original published format: JP 17329487 | JP19880008749 | 19.01.1988 Original published format: JP 874988 | [1989/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0298778 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0298778 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298778 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/18 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
H01S5/24 (EP,US);
H01S5/16 (EP,US);
H01S5/168 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/02] | Title | German: | Halbleiterlaservorrichtungen und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben | [1989/02] | English: | Semiconductor laser devices and methods of making same | [1989/02] | French: | Dispositifs de laser semi-conducteur et leur procédé de fabrication | [1994/05] |
Former [1989/02] | Dispositifs de laser semi-conducteur et procédés pour faire celui-ci | Examination procedure | 18.07.1988 | Examination requested [1989/02] | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4371966 (SCIFRES DONALD R, et al); | [A]US4349905 (ACKLEY DONALD E); | [A]EP0073548 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]EP0174635 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0115390 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]US4282494 (YONEZU HIROO, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, E section, vol. 6, no. 205, October 16, 1982 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 67 E 136 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, E section, vol. 5, no. 186, November 25, 1981 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 139 E 84 |