EP0298780 - Multipack for cans incorporating plastics securing band [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Mead Corporation Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states THE MEAD CORPORATION Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chaussadas, Jean 71 Rue des Glycines Brassioux F-36130 Deols / FR | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306294.5 | 11.07.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | GB19870016355 | 10.07.1987 Original published format: GB 8716355 | GB19880015582 | 02.07.1988 Original published format: GB 8815582 | [1989/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0298780 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298780 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
B65D71/20 (EP,US);
B65D71/02 (KR);
B65D71/00 (KR);
B65D71/06 (EP,US);
B65D71/50 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0016 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/02] | Title | German: | Mehrfachpackung für Dosen mit einem Kunststoff-Befestigungsband | [1989/02] | English: | Multipack for cans incorporating plastics securing band | [1989/02] | French: | Emballage groupé pour boîtes métalliques avec bande plastique de maintien | [1989/02] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 27.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3193979 (FRANZ DOLLHEIMER); | [A]US3547310 (CURRIE GROVER C); | [A]DE2120303 ; | [AD]EP0035912 (MEAD CORP [US]); | [A]US4355717 (OLIFF JAMES R) |