EP0353350 - A process for preparing N-substituted amino acid esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.1993 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. No. 1-Banchi, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu 590 / JP | For all designated states Tanabe Seiyaku Co., Ltd. No. 21 Dosho-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. No. 1-Banchi, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi Osaka-fu 590 / JP | ||
For all designated states Tanabe Seiyaku Co., Ltd. No. 21 Dosho-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | |||
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states Tanabe Seiyaku Co., Ltd. No. 21 Dosho-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takase, Ichirou 940, Shinzaike Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamasaki, Noritsugu 500, Kamiyobe Yobe-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Sato, Kazuo 500, Kamiyobe Yobe-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Goto, Yukihisa 1903-3, Okihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306435.4 | 13.07.1988 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0353350 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353350 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/10, C07C229/16 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
C07C227/08 (EP);
C07C227/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1990/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Estern N-substituierter Aminosäuren | [1990/06] | English: | A process for preparing N-substituted amino acid esters | [1990/06] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation des esters des aminoacides n-substitués | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 30.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0117448 ; | [A]US4542234 ; | [A]EP0096157 |