EP0301736 - Input-output device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DISTRIBUTED MATRIX CONTROLS INC. 1245 Martingrove Road Rexdale Ontario M9W 4X2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | For all designated states DISTRIBUTED MATRIX CONTROLS INC. 1245 Martingrove Road Rexdale Ontario M9W 4X2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McLeish, Anthony Barrington 1406-3590 Kaneff Crescent Mississanga Ontario, L5A 3X3 / CA | 02 /
Hill, Anthony 18203 Yonge Street Holland Landing Ontario, L0G 1H0 / CA | 03 /
Darling, Jim 181 Burgundy Drive Oakville Ontario, N6J 4E9 / CA | 04 /
Dean, David Michael Moore 1090 Falgarwood Drive Oakville Ontario, L6H 1N9 / CA | [1989/05] | Representative(s) | Butler, Michael John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Butler, Michael John, et al FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London, WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306519.5 | 15.07.1988 | [1989/05] | Priority number, date | CA19870542242 | 15.07.1987 Original published format: CA 542242 | [1989/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0301736 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0301736 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/04 | [1989/05] | CPC: |
G05B19/0423 (EP);
G05B2219/21012 (EP);
G05B2219/21085 (EP);
G05B2219/21086 (EP);
G05B2219/21087 (EP);
G05B2219/21088 (EP);
G05B2219/21113 (EP);
G05B2219/21117 (EP);
G05B2219/21119 (EP);
G05B2219/21126 (EP);
G05B2219/21127 (EP);
G05B2219/21137 (EP);
G05B2219/23368 (EP);
G05B2219/25088 (EP);
G05B2219/25089 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1989/05] | Title | German: | Eingangs-Ausgangs-Einrichtung | [1989/05] | English: | Input-output device | [1989/05] | French: | Dispositif d'entrée-sortie | [1989/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 28.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 24.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12] | Request for further processing for: | 03.01.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 03.01.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4517637 ; | [Y]EP0198673 ; | [A]US4172289 |