EP0300748 - Fire resistant polymers containing magnesium oxychloride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.1992 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.1992 [1992/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stewart, Charles Winfield 4 Jobs Lane Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [1989/04] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1989/04] | Application number, filing date | 88306626.8 | 20.07.1988 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | US19870075985 | 21.07.1987 Original published format: US 75985 | [1989/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0300748 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0300748 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/16, C08K3/22, C08L27/12, C08L67/02, C08L77/00 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
C08K3/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/04] | Title | German: | Flammwidrige, Magnesiumoxychlorid enthaltende Polymere | [1989/04] | English: | Fire resistant polymers containing magnesium oxychloride | [1989/04] | French: | Polymères résistant à la flamme contenant de l'oxychlorure de magnésium | [1989/04] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 14.05.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4059560 (LAWSON DAVID FRANCIS, et al) |