EP0300786 - Combined one-piece feeding teat and cap and method of manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.1991 [1991/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVENT MEDICAL LIMITED Prince's Building 22nd Floor Hong Kong / HK | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states AVENT MEDICAL LIMITED Prince's Building 22nd Floor Hong Kong / HK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ford, Donald Robert 1 Barton Grove, Rectory Road Kedington, Suffolk / GB | [1989/04] | Representative(s) | Woodward, John Calvin, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | Woodward, John Calvin, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306698.7 | 21.07.1988 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | GB19870017332 | 22.07.1987 Original published format: GB 8717332 | [1989/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0300786 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0300786 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61J11/04, A61J9/00 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
A61J11/04 (EP);
A61J9/00 (EP);
B29C45/1676 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, IT [1989/04] | Title | German: | Kombination von Sauger und Kappe aus einem Stück und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1989/04] | English: | Combined one-piece feeding teat and cap and method of manufacture thereof | [1989/04] | French: | Combinaison de tétine et couvercle en une seule pièce et procédé de fabrication | [1989/04] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/30] | 26.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2029379 ; | [A]DE2364102 ; | [A]DE2332306 |