EP0303374 - Fruit shake and method of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.1991 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 15.05.1991 [1991/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Industries, Inc. N. 2219 Dickey Road Spokane Washington 99211 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states Olympus Industries, Inc. N. 2219 Dickey Road Spokane Washington 99211 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wade, Bill R. P.O. Box 61 Farmington Washington 99128 / US | 02 /
Wade, Thelma L. P.O. Box 61 Farmington Washington 99128 / US | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | Spall, Christopher John, et al BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306993.2 | 29.07.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | US19870085454 | 14.08.1987 Original published format: US 85454 | US19880220283 | 20.07.1988 Original published format: US 220283 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303374 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303374 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/26, A23G9/02 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
A23G9/52 (EP,US);
A23G9/00 (EP,US);
A23G9/045 (EP,US);
A23G2200/10 (EP,US);
A23G2200/14 (EP,US);
A23G2220/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/07] | Title | German: | Fruchtshake und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1989/07] | English: | Fruit shake and method of making the same | [1989/07] | French: | Fruit-shake et sa méthode de fabrication | [1989/07] | File destroyed: | 02.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 12.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/19] | 20.09.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4609561 (WADE BILL R [US], et al); | [AD]US4293580 (RUBENSTEIN IRVING H); | [A]EP0201974 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) |