EP0305095 - Precision latch assembly having means for restricting pin movement in three degrees of freedom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.1992 [1992/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAISER AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION Kaiser Center 300 Lakeside Drive Oakland California 94612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states KAISER AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION Kaiser Center 300 Lakeside Drive Oakland California 94612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sayre, James L. 1418 Vinci Parkway San Jose California 95131 / US | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | Huntingford, David Ian, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | Huntingford, David Ian, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 88307540.0 | 15.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | US19870089478 | 26.08.1987 Original published format: US 89478 | [1989/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0305095 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0305095 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E05C1/04 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
E05B17/2088 (EP,US);
E05C1/10 (EP,US);
Y10T292/0992 (EP,US);
Y10T292/432 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/09] | Title | German: | Präzisionsverriegelung, welche eine Bewegung in drei Richtungen verhindert | [1989/09] | English: | Precision latch assembly having means for restricting pin movement in three degrees of freedom | [1989/09] | French: | Verrou de précision limitant le mouvement dans trois degrés de liberté | [1989/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 30.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/11] | 17.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3406995 (MCCARTHY JOHN J); | [Y]USRE28355E |