EP0303518 - Improved process for preparing water-absorbing resins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN COLLOID COMPANY One North Arlington, 1500 West Shure Drive Arlington Heights, Illinois 60004 / US | [1990/14] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states AMERICAN COLLOID COMPANY One North Arlington 1500 West Shure Drive Arlington Heights Illinois 60004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alexander, William 242 Terrance Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | 02 /
Anderson, Mark 500 North Carlton Wheaton Illinois 60187 / US | 03 /
Regan, Barbara R. 2724 Harrison Glenview Illinois 60025 / US | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88307546.7 | 15.08.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | US19870085974 | 14.08.1987 Original published format: US 85974 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303518 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303518 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303518 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/06, A61L15/00 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
C08F220/06 (EP,KR);
A61L15/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von wasserabsorbierenden Harzen | [1989/07] | English: | Improved process for preparing water-absorbing resins | [1989/07] | French: | Procédé de préparation de résines absorbant l'eau | [1989/07] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 21.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.1993 | BE | 17.02.1993 | CH | 17.02.1993 | ES | 17.02.1993 | FR | 17.02.1993 | GR | 17.02.1993 | IT | 17.02.1993 | LI | 17.02.1993 | NL | 17.02.1993 | SE | 17.02.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 17.02.1993 | |
BE | 17.02.1993 | ||
CH | 17.02.1993 | ||
ES | 17.02.1993 | ||
GR | 17.02.1993 | ||
IT | 17.02.1993 | ||
LI | 17.02.1993 | ||
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
FR | 09.07.1993 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 17.02.1993 | |
BE | 17.02.1993 | ||
CH | 17.02.1993 | ||
GR | 17.02.1993 | ||
IT | 17.02.1993 | ||
LI | 17.02.1993 | ||
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
FR | 09.07.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 17.02.1993 | |
BE | 17.02.1993 | ||
CH | 17.02.1993 | ||
IT | 17.02.1993 | ||
LI | 17.02.1993 | ||
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
FR | 09.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 17.02.1993 | |
BE | 17.02.1993 | ||
CH | 17.02.1993 | ||
LI | 17.02.1993 | ||
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
FR | 09.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/23] | BE | 17.02.1993 | |
CH | 17.02.1993 | ||
LI | 17.02.1993 | ||
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
FR | 09.07.1993 | ||
Former [1993/47] | BE | 17.02.1993 | |
CH | 17.02.1993 | ||
LI | 17.02.1993 | ||
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | CH | 17.02.1993 | |
LI | 17.02.1993 | ||
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/36] | SE | 17.02.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3239476 (ARAKAWA CHEM IND [JP]); | [X]EP0207714 (AMERICAN COLLOID CO [US]) |