EP0304298 - Magnetic head drive circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohmori, Takashi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fujiie, Kazuhiko c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/11] |
Former [1989/08] | 01 /
Omori, Takashi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Fujiie, Kazuhiko c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88307645.7 | 18.08.1988 | [1989/08] | Priority number, date | JP19870204095 | 19.08.1987 Original published format: JP 20409587 | [1989/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0304298 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0304298 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0304298 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G11B11/10, G11B21/02, G11B5/02 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
G11B5/022 (EP,US);
G11B11/10 (KR);
G11B11/10508 (EP,US);
G11B11/10595 (EP,US);
G11B19/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/08] | G11B11/10, G11B21/02, G11B5/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/08] | Title | German: | Steuerungsschaltung für magnetischen Kopf | [1989/08] | English: | Magnetic head drive circuit | [1989/08] | French: | Circuit de commande de tête magnétique | [1989/08] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 27.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4467407 (ASANO KATSUHIRO [JP], et al) | [APL] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | Examination | JP6394406 | JP6369005 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 331 (P-755)(3178), 7 September 1988: & JP-A-63 94406, & JP6394406 A 19880907 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 295 (P-743)(3142), 11 August 1988; & JP-A-63 69005, & JP6369005 A 19880811 |