EP0307112 - Braided bearing and method for making a braided bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/11] | Braided bearing, braided bearing assembly and method for making braided bearing | ||
[1994/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kamatics Corporation Blue Hills Avenue Bloomfield Connecticut 06002 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states Kamatics Corporation Blue Hills Avenue Bloomfield Connecticut 06002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orkin, Stanley S. 12 John Drive Vernon Connecticut 06066 / US | 02 /
Carlson, Craid L. 127 Wells Road Granby Connecticut 06035 / US | 03 /
Rowlands, David B. 12 Windham Dr. Simsbury Connecticut 06070 / US | [1989/11] | Representative(s) | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough, Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88307874.3 | 25.08.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | US19870095757 | 11.09.1987 Original published format: US 95757 | [1989/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0307112 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0307112 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307112 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/28, D04C1/06 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
D04C3/48 (EP);
B29C70/222 (EP);
B29C70/32 (EP);
D04C1/06 (EP);
F16C17/10 (EP);
F16C33/201 (EP);
F16C33/208 (EP);
F16C33/24 (EP);
F16C33/28 (EP);
B29C2793/009 (EP);
B29C70/545 (EP);
F16C2208/40 (EP);
F16C2220/28 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/11] | F16C33/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/11] | Title | German: | Geflochtenes Lager und Herstellungsverfahren für ein geflochtenes Lager | [1994/10] | English: | Braided bearing and method for making a braided bearing | [1994/10] | French: | Palier tressé et méthode de fabrication d'un palier tressé | [1994/10] |
Former [1989/11] | Geflochtenes Lager, geflochtene Lagereinheit und Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [1989/11] | Braided bearing, braided bearing assembly and method for making braided bearing | ||
Former [1989/11] | Palier tressé, ensemble de paliers tréssés et méthode de fabrication | Examination procedure | 14.09.1988 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 29.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Request for further processing for: | 30.03.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.04.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.10.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2857189 (HOWARD JEFFERY NORMAN); | [A]FR1167769 ; | [A]US3429627 (FREUND RICHARD); | [A]FR2014168 (COURTAULDS LTD); | [A]DE2341333 (SHOBERT SAMUEL MERLE); | [YD]US4228207 (PORTE PIERRE, et al); | [A]US4509870 (TAKI KIYOZI [JP]) | Examination | US2128087 | US3030248 | US3586058 | US3873168 |