EP0305193 - Skin-surfaced foam glass tile and method for production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1993 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INAX CORPORATION 6 Koiehonmachi 3-chome Tokoname-Shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states INAX CORPORATION 6 Koiehonmachi 3-chome Tokoname-Shi Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukumoto, Katsuhisa c/o Inax Corporation No. 6, Koiehonmachi 3-chome Tokoname-shi Aichi / JP | 02 /
Nakada, Ryo c/o Inax Corporation No. 6, Koiehonmachi 3-chome Tokoname-shi Aichi / JP | 03 /
Kawanishi, Kiyotaka c/o Inax Corporation No. 6, Koiehonmachi 3-chome Tokoname-shi Aichi / JP | 04 /
Yamano, Junpei c/o Inax Corporation No. 6, Koiehonmachi 3-chome Tokoname-shi Aichi / JP | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1989/09] | Pritchard, Colin Hubert Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 88307916.2 | 26.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | JP19870212457 | 26.08.1987 Original published format: JP 21245787 | JP19870213673 | 27.08.1987 Original published format: JP 21367387 | [1989/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0305193 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0305193 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0305193 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C03C11/00, C03B19/08 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
E04F15/08 (EP);
C03C27/10 (KR);
C03C11/007 (EP);
C04B14/24 (KR);
E04F13/145 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/09] | C03C11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/09] | Title | German: | Schaumglasplatte mit dichter Oberfläche und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1989/09] | English: | Skin-surfaced foam glass tile and method for production thereof | [1989/09] | French: | Carreau de verre cellulaire à surface étanche et méthode pour le produire | [1989/09] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 19.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60176932 ; | [A]JP60033219 ; | [A]US2202714 (NASH ARTHUR D); | [A]US2310432 (HAUX ELMER H); | [A]DE913579 (SAINT GOBAIN); | [A]US3330627 (MCCORMICK WALTER R, et al); | [A]US3468989 (MCMILLAN WILLIAM J) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 23 (C-325)[2080], 29th January 1986; & JP-A-60 176 932 (INA SEITOU K.K.) 11-09-1985, & JP60176932 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 153 (C-288)[1876], 27th June 1985; & JP-A-60 033 219 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO K.K.) 20-02-1985, & JP60033219 A 00000000 |