EP0308102 - Process for preparing an artificial blood vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/12] | Artificial blood vessel and process for preparing it | ||
[1992/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken 755-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | For all designated states UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaneko, Noriaki Yokohama Branch of China Res. Lab. Ube Industries, Ltd. 5996-1, Shin-yoshida-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Hirata, Yoshimi Yokohama Branch of China Res. Lab. Ube Industries, Ltd. 5996-1, Shin-yoshida-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Moriwaki, Masahiro Yokohama Branch of China Res. L Ube Industries, Ltd. 5996-1, Shin-yoshida-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308063.2 | 31.08.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | JP19870220351 | 04.09.1987 Original published format: JP 22035187 | JP19870220352 | 04.09.1987 Original published format: JP 22035287 | JP19870220353 | 04.09.1987 Original published format: JP 22035387 | [1989/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0308102 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0308102 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
A61L27/20 (EP,US);
A61F2/06 (EP,US);
A61L27/16 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zu Herstellung eines künstlichen Blutgefässes | [1992/23] | English: | Process for preparing an artificial blood vessel | [1992/23] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'un vaisseau sanguin artificiel | [1992/23] |
Former [1989/12] | Künstliches Blutgefäss und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | ||
Former [1989/12] | Artificial blood vessel and process for preparing it | ||
Former [1989/12] | Vaisseau sanguin artificiel et procédé pour sa préparation | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/23: Teilanmeldung 91108239.4 eingereicht am 31/08/88 | EPB 1992/23: Divisional application 91108239.4 filed on 31/08/88 | EPB 1992/23: Demande divisionnaire 91108239.4 déposée le 31/08/88 | Examination procedure | 24.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 20.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP91108239.4 / EP0446965 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0143638 (SHILEY INC [US]); | [X]US4355426 (MACGREGOR DAVID C); | [Y]EP0128501 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [A]DE3209044 (ONTARIO RESEARCH FOUNDATION [CA]); | [XP]EP0266035 (ETHICON INC [US], et al) | Examination | EP0216149 | EP0130401 | - WO 85/03445 |