EP0308134 - Specular machining apparatus for peripheral edge portion of wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPEEDFAM CO., LTD. 30-3, Nishirokugo 4-Chome Oota-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeda, Seiichi c/o Speedfam Co., Ltd. 2647 Hayakawa Ayase-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Nagahashi, Isao c/o Speedfam Co., Ltd. 2647 Hayakawa Ayase-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308296.8 | 08.09.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | JP19870230399 | 14.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23039987 | [1989/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0308134 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0308134 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
B24B9/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1989/12] | Title | German: | Apparat zur spiegelnden Bearbeitung eines Umkreiskantenteils eines Plättchens | [1989/12] | English: | Specular machining apparatus for peripheral edge portion of wafer | [1989/12] | French: | Appareil d'usinage miroitant pour une partie formant l'arête périphérique d'une plaquette | [1989/12] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 30.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/40] | 05.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59214554 ; | [A]JP60217624 ; | [A]FR2558094 (LECLERC SERGE [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 87 (M-372)(1810) 17 April 1985, & JP-A-59 214554 (DAIICHI SEIKI K.K.) 4 December 1984,, & JP59214554 A 19841204 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 65 (E-388)(2122) 14 March 1986, & JP-A-60 217624 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 31 October 1985,, & JP60217624 A 19851031 |