EP0307237 - Signal amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1992 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIVINGSTON REALISATIONS LIMITED: in receivership MacIntosh Road Kirkton Campus Livingston EH54 7BW Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | For all designated states LIVINGSTON REALISATIONS LIMITED: in receivership MacIntosh Road Kirkton Campus Livingston EH54 7BW Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states INTEGRATED POWER SEMICONDUCTORS LTD. MacIntosh Road Kirkton Campus Livingston EH54 7BW Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pennock, John Laurence 39, Baberton Crescent Juniper Green, Edinburgh EH14 5BW / GB | [1989/11] | Representative(s) | Pike, Harold John, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | [1989/11] | Application number, filing date | 88308368.5 | 09.09.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | GB19870021329 | 10.09.1987 Original published format: GB 8721329 | [1989/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0307237 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0307237 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/30 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
H03F1/305 (EP);
H03F1/307 (EP);
H03F3/04 (KR);
H03F3/3081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/11] | Title | German: | Signalverstärker | [1989/11] | English: | Signal amplifier | [1989/11] | French: | Amplificateur de signal | [1989/11] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 01.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/40] | 07.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.1990 | 30.09.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60123112 ; | [X]US3768031 (RING C); | [A]GB2140638 (MULTITONE ELECTRONICS PLC); | [A]US3087015 (WITZKE ERNEST C) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 280 (E-356)[2003], 8th November 1985; & JP-A-60 123 112 (OKI DENKI KOGYO K.K.), & JP60123112 A 00000000 | [A] - SIEMENS COMPONENTS, vol. 20, no. 4, August 1985, page 172, Berlin, DE; "Short-circuit proof TCA 2365A dual power op-amp in DIP package" |